Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kipke, Krebs, Morales, Platt, West, Carozza, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Kelly, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a general hospice care program, when providing services in an in-home setting, to establish a written unused prescription medication collection and disposal policy that includes certain provisions; requiring an employee of a general hospice care program, as soon as practicable, to collect and dispose of a certain patient's unused prescription medication under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0232
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876589/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {876589/1 Adopted 36
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 38
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Finance 39
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Text - Chapter - Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM