Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund to be the Chesapeake Bay and State Waters Trust Fund; modifying the purpose of the Fund to include the restoration and protection of the health of the waters of the State; and expanding the use of the Fund to include certain projects to improve and protect the health of the waters of the State.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0947 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1617.1 )
(   5-307, 8-2A-01, 8-2A-02 )
(   2-1104, 2-1302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM