Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Moon, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that any gas service newly installed at an occupied structure may have a gas service regulator installed only outside the structure; requiring an existing interior gas service regulator to be relocated outside whenever a gas service line, meter, or regulator is replaced; requiring an existing interior gas service regulator servicing a multifamily structure to be relocated outside on or before October 1, 2025; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 11:13 AM