Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Primary Elections and Early Voting - Dates
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Metzgar, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a primary election from being held on Purim, Passover, Good Friday, Easter, the first day of Ramadan, Rosh Hashanah or Yom Kippur; requiring a primary election that would otherwise be held on the date of a specified holiday to instead be held seven days after the holiday; and prohibiting an early voting center from being open for voting on specified holidays.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1, 8-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM