Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a holder of a Class 5 brewery license in Baltimore County to sell at retail kegs of beer for off-premises consumption to individuals who have attained the legal drinking age; authorizing an individual who has attained the legal drinking age to purchase a keg of beer from a holder of a Class 5 brewery license in Baltimore County; authorizing a holder of a Class 7 micro-brewery license in Baltimore County to sell at retail kegs of beer for off-premises consumption to individuals who are of the legal drinking age; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing Act
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-102, 13-401, 13-403, 13-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM