Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Subsequent Conviction or Pending Criminal Proceeding
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Rosenberg, Carter, Branch, Braveboy, Conaway, Davis, Gaines, Glenn, Harper, Haynes, Holmes, Ivey, Jones, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, B. Robinson, Stukes, Summers, Swain, Tarrant, V. Turner, Vaughn, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Third Reading Failed (69-65)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law establishing that a person is not entitled to expungement if the person has been convicted of a crime other than a specified violation or is a defendant in a pending criminal proceeding under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0376
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {312014/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Motion Tabled (Delegate Olszewski) Rejected (58-72)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Failed (69-65)
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {312014/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Motion Tabled (Delegate Olszewski) Rejected (58-72) 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Failed (69-65) 47
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM