Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Aumann, Beitzel, Holmes, Arentz, and Carey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring a court to order a person convicted of poaching deer on any land in the State to pay the State specified restitution and to perform 40 to 80 hours of community service under specified circumstances; requiring the restitution collected under the provisions of the Act to be credited to the State Wildlife Management and Protection Fund; encouraging the Department of Natural Resources in cooperation with local law enforcement agencies to develop time-sensitive approaches to deer poaching; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {490818/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {490818/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-1101.1, 10-1102, 10-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM