Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, Wivell, Jameson, and Clippinger
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland Energy Innovation Institute as part of the A. James Clark School of Engineering to collaborate with academic institutions on clean energy programs in the State and to attract private investment to clean energy innovation and commercialization in the State; establishing the Maryland Energy Innovation Fund to be used by the Institute and the Maryland Clean Energy Center; requiring the Center to develop a plan to become self-sustaining 5 years after the effective date of the Act; altering the purposes of the Center; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0313
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413391/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-11)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {413391/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (123-11) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-801, 10-806, 10-807, 10-808, 10-810, 10-823, 10-825, 10-828 through 10-839, 10-829 through 10-837 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM