Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsored by
Delegates West and Aumann
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to place and maintain traffic control devices at specified entrances and exits of large continuing care retirement communities, those serving at least 100 residents, and located along highways under the Administration's jurisdiction; requiring the Administration to provide a specified notice to the owner or manager of the large continuing care retirement community at least 30 days before installation of the traffic control device is scheduled to begin; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0418
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   25-106.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page