Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Bartlett, Crutchfield, Feldmark, and Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in certain sexual acts, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a victim, witness, or suspect in an investigation during the course of an investigation that the officer is conducting, supervising, or assisting with, or with a certain person requesting assistance from or responding to the law enforcement officer in the course of the officer's official duties; and establishing a certain exception to the prohibition under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0043
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/21/2020
Legislative Date
9/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/21/2020 9/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/14/2021 4:28 PM