Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate McMillan
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the amount of the fee that a condominium council of unit owners may charge a unit owner to furnish a certificate with the information necessary for the unit owner to comply with specified resale disclosure requirements; requiring a homeowners association or specified officers or agents to provide within 20 days after a written request by a unit owner and receipt of a reasonable fee the information necessary to comply with specified resale disclosure requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0229
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {410016/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-8)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {410016/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (125-8) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
(   11-135, 11B-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page