Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Sponsored by
Delegates West, Aumann, Barron, and Kramer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing Title 6 of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing bulk transfers; making specified conforming changes; and providing that the rights and obligations that arose under Title 6 of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code before its repeal by the Act remain valid and may be enforced as though Title 6 had not been repealed.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0789
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 2-403, 6-101 through 6-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM