Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing procedures for the election and appointment of the members of the Baltimore County Board of Education; repealing provisions governing the appointment of members of the county board; establishing the composition of the county board; requiring members of the county board to reside in, be a registered voter in, and be elected from specified districts; providing for a student member of the county board; providing for the removal of, and hearings and appeal procedures for, specified members of the county board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0010
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0481 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-109, 3-114, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM