Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cedar Hope Chests - Prohibition on Manufacture, Import, and Sale (McKenna's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell and Kelly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering or manufacturing for sale a cedar hope chest that has a design identified by the United States Consumer Product Safety Commission as presenting a risk of suffocation death to children who could become entrapped in the chest, has a lid latch that locks automatically and cannot be unlocked from the inside; providing for specified penalties; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to implement a specified public awareness program and adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM