Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Assistance Employment Initiative Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Medical Assistance Employment Initiative Pilot Program in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to identify workforce development opportunities and to develop a certain plan to provide certain opportunities to pilot program participants; requiring the Secretary to administer the Pilot Program in collaboration with the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Secretary to collect certain data for certain purposes; authorizing the Secretary to collaborate with employers for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Assistance Employment Initiative Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Medical Assistance Employment Initiative Pilot Program
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM