Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Atterbeary, Barron, Carr, Ebersole, Hayes, Kelly, Krimm, Lam, Morales, Morhaim, Turner, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with a the State Advisory Council on Quality Care at the End of Life, to develop an end-of-life decision-making informational booklet; requiring the Department to distribute the booklet to specified health care providers, make the booklet available to the public on a specified Web site, and annually review and update the booklet as necessary; requiring health care providers to provide the booklet to specified patients under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0873
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM