Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Hettleman, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an appointing authority from taking certain actions against an applicant for employment because the applicant did not provide the applicant's wage history; prohibiting an appointing authority from relying on an applicant's wage history for certain purposes and from seeking the applicant's wage history by certain methods; authorizing an appointing authority to rely on an applicant's wage history under certain circumstances; requiring a certain report on the effect of laws prohibiting consideration of wage history; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0400
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/6/2020 9:31 AM