Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate Adjustments
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Angel, Ebersole, Frick, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Jackson, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, McCray, A. Miller, Morales, Platt, Reznik, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to conduct a specified analysis regarding the Child Care Subsidy Program beginning in 2017 and every 2 years thereafter; requiring the Department to consult with specified entities before conducting a specified analysis; and requiring the Department to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before September 1, 2017, and by September 1 every 2 years thereafter.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0294
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate Adjustments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate Adjustments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate Adjustments
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate Adjustments
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate Adjustments
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 31
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text - Chapter - Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate Adjustments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM