Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Administering Injectable Medications and Biological Products
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Johnson, Kipke, Pena-Melnyk, and Shetty
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of certain regulations to administer an injectable medication or a biological product to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, on or before September 1, 2020, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt certain regulations for pharmacists to administer an injectable medication or a biological product; establishing certain requirements for the regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0577
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Administering Injectable Medications and Biological Products
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-509 )
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM