Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering procedures of the Maryland Transportation Authority for the collection of unpaid tolls through a specified notice and a citation for toll violations; altering the contents of a specified citation; altering procedures for paying or contesting the amounts due under a citation; providing for the admissibility and prima facie effect of the information in a citation in any proceeding to contest liability; altering specified defenses to a citation; altering procedures for collection of unpaid tolls and civil penalties; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {470217/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827274/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {843124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {470217/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 53
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {827274/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {843124/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1414, 21-1415, 26-401, 27-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM