Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Cullison, Hill, Reznik, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring hospitals, related institutions, alternative health systems, and employers to report specified employment actions and terminations of employment of athletic trainers and physician assistants to the State Board of Physicians, subject to specified exceptions; requiring athletic trainers and physician assistants to notify hospitals, related institutions, alternative health systems, or employers of a decision to enter an alcohol or a drug treatment program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0717
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5D-14.1, 15-314.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM