Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Barnes
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to conduct a study of the participation of minority-owned businesses in the alcoholic beverages industry in the State; providing for the inclusion of certain issues in the study; requiring the Office to conduct the study in consultation and cooperation with certain agencies and interests; requiring the Office to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2022; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0285
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1333 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page