Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Adams, Afzali, Cassilly, Fisher, S. Howard, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, Miele, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting, with respect to property placed in service before January 1, 2016, the applicability of Maryland income tax modifications for specified deductions for the cost of business property that is treated as an expense for federal income tax purposes; limiting, with respect to property placed in service before January 1, 2016, the applicability of Maryland income tax modifications for a specified additional depreciation allowance under the federal income tax for specified business property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0880 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-210.1, 10-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM