Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Anacostia River Trail - Solar Lighting Study PG/MC 114-18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to study and make recommendations regarding the use of solar lighting along the Anacostia River Trail from Bladensburg Road to Charles Armentrout Drive; and requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the members of the Prince George's County delegation to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Anacostia River Trail - Solar Lighting Study PG/MC 114-18
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM