Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Medication Technician Graduates and Certified Medication Technicians - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Nathan-Pulliam and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the termination date for specified provisions of law concerning medication technician graduates and certified medication technicians; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0338
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756288/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {756288/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 33
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM