Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Interest on Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegate Sophocleus (By Request - Anne Arundel County Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the rate of interest at which specified money is required to be refunded to a taxpayer on a final determination of an appeal concerning a county or municipal corporation property tax or taxing district property tax to equal the rate of interest equivalent to the historical rate of return for the county or municipal corporation, as certified by the State Treasurer.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0143
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-611 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM