Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B and Class H Licenses - Renewals
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett and Chang
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a license holder, before each renewal of a Class B or Class H alcoholic beverages license in Anne Arundel County, to attest in a sworn statement that the gross receipts from food sales for the 12-month period immediately preceding the application for renewal were equal to at least 51% of the gross receipts from the sale of food and alcoholic beverages.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0037
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B and Class H Licenses - Renewals
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/18/2020 1:33 PM