Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates Hogan, Beidle, Eckardt, Elliott, George, Hough, Jacobs, Kach, Kipke, McComas, McConkey, McMillan, Otto, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Schulz, Stocksdale, Szeliga, F. Turner, Vitale, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the State income tax under specified circumstances for costs incurred by an individual for an approved lead hazard reduction project for qualifying property; providing for the calculation of the subtraction modification; providing for the submission of proposals for lead hazard reduction projects to the Department of Housing and Community Development for approval; applying the Act to tax years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-210.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM