Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Krebs, Metzgar, Shoemaker, Hill, McDonough, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from burying or disposing of a body except in a specified manner; and establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 1 year or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both, for violation of the Act.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1236 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {626085/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {626085/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Finance 43
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-514 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM