Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Kelly, Carozza, Anderton, Angel, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Beitzel, Brooks, Chang, Clippinger, Cluster, Cullison, Davis, Frush, Gaines, Ghrist, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kipke, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, Miele, A. Miller, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Simonaire, Smith, Sophocleus, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, West, C. Wilson, P. Young, Queen, Carr, Barron, Hill, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to establish the Maryland ABLE Program to help promote financial savings to support individuals with disabilities in maintaining health, independence, and quality of life; renaming the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to be the Maryland 529 Board; requiring the Board to work in consultation with the Department of Disabilities regarding the Maryland ABLE Program; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0355
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {366889/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {366889/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1901, 18-1902.1, 18-1904, 18-1905, 18-19A-05, 18-19B-05, 18-19C-01 through 18-19C-10 )
(   10-205, 10-207, 10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM