Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsored by
Delegates Beitzel, K. Kelly, Myers, Parrott, and Serafini
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on a Sunday on specified property from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January of the following year, inclusive, in Frederick County, subject to specified provisions of law.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0473
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {810313/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-15)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224935/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-11)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {810313/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (115-15) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {224935/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4) 60
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (121-11) 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM