Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, with a specified exception, a person from applying a lawn care pesticide on the grounds of specified child care facilities and schools; authorizing a person to apply a lawn care pesticide on the grounds of specified child care facilities and schools if the Secretary of Agriculture determines that the emergency application is necessary to eliminate an immediate threat to human health; requiring a specified notice of an emergency application; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-208.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM