Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Glass, S. Howard, Krebs, Long, McDonough, Metzgar, W. Miller, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General, at least 90 days before the implementation of any law that reduces penalties for or legalizes the use of marijuana, to establish an information system, including the creation of a Web site and public service announcements for radio, television, newspapers, and billboards, to notify the public of the risks related to the change in the law.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0889 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM