Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a motor vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch to provide a certain notice of warranty requirements to the purchaser or lessee of a new motor vehicle within 90 days after the purchase or lease of the motor vehicle; and providing the Act does not apply to a new motor vehicle purchased solely for commercial or industrial use.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0529
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143190/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117676/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117676/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {143190/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {117676/1 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Manno) Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments {117676/1 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-210.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM