Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pediatric Stroke – Awareness, Training, and Resource Materials (Laney Jaymes Fitzsimons Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Pena-Melnyk, Hill, Jalisi, Johnson, Kipke, R. Lewis, and Shetty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with the Maryland Department of Health, to promote awareness in and provide training for directors of student services in local education agencies regarding pediatric stroke; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide to the State Department of Education certain information regarding pediatric stroke.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0307
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Pediatric Stroke – Awareness, Training, and Resource Materials (Laney Jaymes Fitzsimons Act)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM