Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck
Sponsored by
Delegates Rudolph and Malone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring drivers approaching properly registered tow trucks that are stopped, standing, or parked on a highway and using specified visual signals, unless otherwise directed by a police officer or traffic control device, to change lanes into an available lane not immediately adjacent to the tow truck under specified circumstances, or to slow to a reasonable and prudent speed that is safe for existing weather, road, and vehicular or pedestrian traffic conditions.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0003
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {160219/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments {160219/1 Report Adopted 39
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 41
Senate 3/28/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-405, 22-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM