Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Jalisi, Jones, and McComas
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a guardian of the property of a person with a physical or mental disability, a guardian of the property of a person with certain other conditions, and a guardian of the property of a minor shall be appointed; establishing certain procedures for the appointment of certain guardians of the property; requiring a certain petition alleging that a person has a mental disability or disease to include certain certificates of competency from certain health care professionals; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 13-201, 13-201.1, 13-201.2, 13-201.3, 13-203, 13-210, 13-211, 13-212, 13-218, 13-223, 13-704, 13-705, 13-709, 13-801, 13-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM