Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified State and local law enforcement agencies to reimburse individuals who take possession of dogs formerly used in law enforcement work, on or after October 1, 2016, for reasonable and necessary veterinary treatment provided to the dogs; specifying that the reimbursement may be only for usual and customary veterinary treatment and may not exceed $2,500; authorizing specified State law enforcement agencies to accept public donations for the payment of specified veterinary expenses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0917
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0505 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {382910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {382910/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM