Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring certain county boards of education to collect and track certain data relating to pregnant, expecting, and parenting students and submit certain data to the Institute for Innovation and Implementation in the University of Maryland School of Social Work on or before June 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; requiring the Institute to document and analyze certain data and to use certain information to develop recommendations on legislation, regulations, and policy initiatives needed to address certain issues; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
(   4-138 )
Last Updated: 1/25/2021 9:33 AM
Click to return on the top page