Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - Completion of Interconnection
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company, subject to a specified provision, to issue acceptance and final approval to operate a customer-generator's solar electric generating facility on the electric company's distribution facilities within 20 business days after the completion of the installation process and receipt of specified paperwork and documentation; requiring an electric company to complete specified interconnection requirements for at least 90% of installation processes completed during the year in a specified territory; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663390/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {797079/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {663390/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Finance 28
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {797079/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM