Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Death Penalty Court
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Boteler, Dwyer, McDonough, W. Miller, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the General Assembly to create a Death Penalty Court that shall have original and exclusive jurisdiction over all presentments or indictments for offenses punishable by death; vesting the judicial power of the State in the Death Penalty Court as the General Assembly may create by law; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0794 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM