Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the billing rights for anesthesia services provided in a freestanding ambulatory care facility from being assigned to a person that has a beneficial interest in the freestanding ambulatory care facility; prohibiting a freestanding ambulatory care facility or a person that has a beneficial interest in the freestanding ambulatory care facility from charging, directly or indirectly, an anesthesia services provider a fee for management services; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0980
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-307, 14-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM