Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction in Public and Nonpublic High Schools
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Conaway, Hill, Hornberger, Kelly, Lam, Luedtke, Morhaim, Platt, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Encouraging a county board of education to provide age-appropriate instruction on organ and tissue donation and registration in the public high schools in the county; specifying the purposes and goals of the instruction are to describe certain benefits, address the myths and misconceptions, and explain the options available to minors and adults related to organ and tissue donation; and encouraging nonpublic high schools to provide certain instruction on organ and tissue donation.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {915268/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction in Public Schools
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {915268/1 Adopted 33
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Education – Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction in Public and Nonpublic High Schools
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 35
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM