Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Anderson, Arora, Barnes, Bobo, Braveboy, Burns, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haynes, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Lee, Love, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Swain, Tarrant, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified level of funding for the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program; increasing the tobacco tax rates on cigarettes and other tobacco products; requiring certain wholesalers of cigarettes and other tobacco products to report the amount of other tobacco products sold on a tobacco tax return; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0589
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0683 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-105, 12-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM