Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Use of Dogs and Cats in Research Facilities - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Kaiser, McComas, Morales, Platt, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified research facilities from knowingly using specified dogs and cats for scientific research purposes; authorizing specified euthanasia for specified dogs and cats used for scientific research purposes; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; requiring the Attorney General to investigate specified violations; authorizing the Attorney General to prosecute specified violations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-626 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM