Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0443


CH0209

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 209
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a Southern Maryland code county to enact a local law that provides regular employees of the county with certain collective bargaining rights; requiring a certain local law to provide definitions of and remedies for unfair labor practices and prohibit certain strikes or work stoppages by certain employees; providing that "regular employee" does not include an appointed or elected official, or a supervisory, managerial, or confidential employee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0430
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-12)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 209
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (117-12) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Finance 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 209
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:13 PM