Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeless Expenditures Accountability Act
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Anderson, Aumann, Carter, Chang, Frush, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Impallaria, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each State, local, and nonprofit agency that receives federal, State, or local funding to remedy and prevent homelessness to report specified information annually to the Interagency Council on Homelessness; requiring each county to report specified information annually to the Council; requiring the first reports to be filed on or before December 31, 2015, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-418, 6-423, 6-423.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM