Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Chang, Hettleman, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, and P. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State to provide a supplement to increase the total benefit to $30 per month to a household that includes an individual who is at least 62 years old and receives a federally funded benefit in an amount less than $30 per month under the food stamp program.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0758
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974069/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-12)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237778/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-19)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments {974069/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (125-12) 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {237778/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8) 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (117-19) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM