Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
Sponsored by
Delegates West, Cullison, Krebs, Metzgar, and Morhaim
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified educational program on acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS) for persons who plead guilty or nolo contendere to or are found guilty of specified drug- or sex-related crimes.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0185
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36
Text - Third - Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 38
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM