Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hazing
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young and Reznik
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the offense of hazing is committed by subjecting a student to the risk of serious bodily injury, regardless of whether injury actually occurs, for the purpose of an initiation into a student organization of a school, college, or university; and increasing the penalty from $500 to $5,000 for a specified offense relating to subjecting a student to the risk of serious bodily injury.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0394
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM